MO SB385 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 385-Bernskoetter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 385-Bernskoetter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property located in Cole County
Title
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property located in Cole County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 385-Bernskoetter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 385-Bernskoetter |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3693932 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB385.pdf |