MO SB383 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Missouri State Archives-St. Louis Trust Fund
Title
Repeals the Missouri State Archives-St. Louis Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | S First Read |