MO SB383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1722S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1722S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the sale of utilities in fourth class cities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the sale of utilities in fourth class cities
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1722S.05C) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 383-Emery |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3679693 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB383.pdf |