MO SB381 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements relating to health and family education taught in public elementary and secondary schools
Title
Establishes requirements relating to health and family education taught in public elementary and secondary schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |