MO SB380 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 380-Wieland, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 380-Wieland, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | In Conference--SCS for SB 380-Wieland, with HCS, as amended |
2015-05-07 | House | H conferees appointed: Lair, Cornejo, Dugger, Kirkton, Arthur |
2015-05-07 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-05-06 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-05-06 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Morris)--(1264H04.33H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(1264H04.06H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(1264H04.14H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 11, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(1264H04.40H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered (Swan)--(1264H04.30H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & defeated (Hinson)--(1264H04.21H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(1264H04.11H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(1264H04.07H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Rowden)--(1264H04.10H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Morris)--(1264H04.16H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(1264H04.19H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-57)--(1264H04.09H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(1264H04.12H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(1264H04.22H) |
2015-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(1264H04.03H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee w/Amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-03-30 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted (1264S.03C) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (1264S.03C) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | S First Read--SB 380-Wieland |