MO SB376 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies voting qualifications
Title
Modifies voting qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |