MO SB375 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies licensing requirements for nursing home administrators
Title
Modifies licensing requirements for nursing home administrators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S First Read--SB 375-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3598576 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB375.pdf |