MO SB373 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to the elderly
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to the elderly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2017-05-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2017-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Motion to recall bill as not needed for Fiscal Review (Cunningham) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-04-11 | Senate | SA 1 S withdrawn |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Point of order S withdrawn |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Point of order - SA 1 beyond scope - Taken under advisement - Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Wallingford)--(1622S01.02S) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Taken up for perfection |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 373-Curls |