MO SB37 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: SB 37 (HA 1 HA 6) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: SB 37 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: SB 37 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | In Conference |
2021-05-13 | House | H distributes CCS--(0772S.04S) |
2021-05-13 | House | H distributes CCR--(0722S04.1SR) |
2021-05-05 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Bernskoetter, Bean, Hoskins, Beck, Razer |
2021-05-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Knight, Rone, Francis, McCreery, Mackey |
2021-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2021-04-29 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 & HA 6 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2021-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 6 H adopted--(0772S01.14H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 H offered & defeated (Collins)--(0772S01.17H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 6 H offered (Rone)--(0772S01.14H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Mackey)--(0772S01.11H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Sharpe-4)--(0772S01.03H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Francis)--(0772S01.12H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Haffner)--(0772S01.07H) |
2021-04-28 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Sharpe-4)--(0772S01.04H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2021-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2021-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2021-02-11 | House | H First Read |
2021-02-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |