MO SB37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense and penalties of promoting prostitution in the first degree
Title
Modifies the offense and penalties of promoting prostitution in the first degree
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-05-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2019-05-08 | House | Hearing Cancelled H Judiciary Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-referred H Judiciary |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2019-05-06 | House | H Second Read |
2019-05-02 | House | H First Read |
2019-05-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)--(0223S04.01S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(0223S04.03S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Onder)--(0223S.04F) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0223S.03C) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 37-Onder and Nasheed |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |