MO SB369 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for purchasers to obtain salvage titles for vehicles sold for salvage within six years of their designated model year
Title
Repeals the requirement for purchasers to obtain salvage titles for vehicles sold for salvage within six years of their designated model year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 369-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3511515 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB369.pdf |