MO SB369 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the authority of the Governor to convey easements without the approval of the General Assembly and allows the Governor to convey certain specified properties
Title
Expands the authority of the Governor to convey easements without the approval of the General Assembly and allows the Governor to convey certain specified properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS (pending) |
2015-05-12 | House | Bill placed back on calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-12 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(1652H03.08H) |
2015-05-12 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Hummel)--(1652H03.04H) |
2015-05-12 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(1652H03.03H) |
2015-05-12 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(1652H03.01H) |
2015-05-12 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(1652H03.02H) |
2015-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Corrections w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Corrections w/Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Corrections |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Corrections Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(1652S02.01S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | S First Read--SB 369-Pearce |