MO SB368 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 368 (6, 7 AND 8) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 368 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 120 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 368 (HA 7) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: SB 368 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16SenateH adopts CCR
2019-05-13SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-09SenateReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-09SenateH distributes CCR
2019-05-09HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2019-05-09HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Hough)--(1861S02.1SR)
2019-05-07HouseSenate conferees appointed: Hough, Libla, Romine, Curls, Williams
2019-05-06HouseHouse conferees appointed: Shawan, Ruth, Patterson, Butz, Razer
2019-05-06HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-05-02HouseS refuses to concur in HA 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 & 8 and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-05-01HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended
2019-05-01HouseHA 8 H offered & adopted (Patterson)--(1861S01.09H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 7 H offered & adopted (Butz)--(1861S01.14H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 6 H offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(1861S01.18H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 5 H offered & adopted (Shaul-113)--(1861S01.13H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 4 H offered & adopted (Busick)--(1861S01.12H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 3 H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(1861S01.10H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(1861S01.16H)
2019-05-01HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(1861S01.11H)
2019-04-30HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-25HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-18HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-04-18HouseReported Do Pass H Transportation
2019-04-18HouseVoted Do Pass H Transportation
2019-04-11HouseHearing Conducted H Transportation
2019-04-03HouseReferred H Transportation
2019-04-01HouseH Second Read
2019-03-28HouseH First Read
2019-03-28SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent
2019-03-14SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted
2019-03-14SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-03-07SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateS First Read--SB 368-Hough

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback