MO SB365 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to students with special needs
Title
Modifies provisions relating to students with special needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education w/HCA 1 |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education w/Amendments |
2015-04-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-16 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-14 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(1935S.03F) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | S First Read--SB 365-Schmitt |