MO SB363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to long-term care facilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to long-term care facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2017-05-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 363-Chappelle-Nadal |