MO SB360 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 360, 238 & 360)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 360, 238 & 360)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to virtual public schools
Title
Modifies provisions relating to virtual public schools
Sponsors
Sen. Denny Hoskins [R] | Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Sen. Robert Onder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 360, 238 & 360) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 360-Hoskins, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=58177493 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB360.pdf |