MO SB358 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (1805S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (1805S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that licensed professional counseling includes the diagnosis of mental, emotional, and behavior disorders and allows the committee for professional counselors to require certain education or training in diagnostic skills
Title
Specifies that licensed professional counseling includes the diagnosis of mental, emotional, and behavior disorders and allows the committee for professional counselors to require certain education or training in diagnostic skills
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (1805S.04C) | |
2011-03-07 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SB 358-Wasson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4200138 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB358.pdf |