MO SB35 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 35-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 35-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates additional requirements for public assistance eligibility verification
Title
Creates additional requirements for public assistance eligibility verification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | In Conference--SCS for SB 35-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | H distributes CCR (0273S06.1SR) |
2015-05-06 | House | S conferees appointed: Wallingford, Romine, Brown, Keaveny, Schupp |
2015-05-06 | House | H conferees appointed: Haefner, Barnes, Allen, Lafaver, Kirkton |
2015-05-06 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-05-05 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowden)--(0273H05.10H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(0273H05.07H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0273H05.13H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Barnes)--(0273H05.08H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 3 to HCS H withdrawn |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed back on calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Eggleston)--(0273H05.03H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (English)--(0273H05.05H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(0273H05.02H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-17 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-02-10 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-01-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee (0273S.03C) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 35-Wallingford |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |