MO SB35 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Hearing Cancelled S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - Hearing Cancelled S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child support when there is equal parenting time
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child support when there is equal parenting time
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Hearing Cancelled S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 35-Lembke | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4065275 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB35.pdf |