MO SB349 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Board of Trustees of the Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis to act as trustees and administer other pension plans
Title
Allows the Board of Trustees of the Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis to act as trustees and administer other pension plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled |