MO SB349 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 349-O'Laughlin, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each local school district and charter school to have a policy for reading intervention plans for any pupils in grades kindergarten through four

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each local school district and charter school to have a policy for reading intervention plans for any pupils in grades kindergarten through four

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 349-O'Laughlin, with SCS
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS
2019-03-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1825S.02C)
2019-03-05SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2019-02-21SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2019-02-06SenateS First Read--SB 349-O'Laughlin

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback