MO SB341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to the protection of children and other vulnerable persons
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to the protection of children and other vulnerable persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Zerr)--(1561H04.06H) |
2015-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(1561H04.01F) |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Children and Families Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Children and Families Committee w/Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Children and Families Committee |
2015-03-20 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-19 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-19 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-17 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(1561S03.01S) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (1561S.03C) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 341-Riddle |