MO SB340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1771S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1771S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to alcohol trade practices
Title
Modifies provisions relating to alcohol trade practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1771S.03C) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 340-Wieland |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2887514 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB340.pdf |