MO SB34 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to coroners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to coroners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Formal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-01HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-30HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-24HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-04-24HouseH Second Read
2019-04-23HouseH First Read
2019-04-18SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-18SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-17SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-11SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-11SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-10SenatePerfected
2019-04-10SenateSS for SCS S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0384S.04F)
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS
2019-02-28SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (0384S.03C)
2019-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 34-Riddle
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback