MO SB337 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bans the Conservation Commission and the Department of Conservation from engaging in prohibited conduct with a connected not-for-profit corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bans the Conservation Commission and the Department of Conservation from engaging in prohibited conduct with a connected not-for-profit corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2015-03-17SenateHearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2015-02-19SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2015-01-28SenateS First Read--SB 337-Munzlinger

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback