MO SB336 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires internet service providers to authenticate access to obscene websites and provide subscribers the ability to create an authentication to access such websites

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires internet service providers to authenticate access to obscene websites and provide subscribers the ability to create an authentication to access such websites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateVoted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2021-02-24SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2021-02-04SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-30SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback