MO SB335 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to wholesale electric energy
Title
Creates provisions relating to wholesale electric energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled |