MO SB330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 330-Brown, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended & HA 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an "Association of Missouri Electrical Cooperatives" special license plate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an "Association of Missouri Electrical Cooperatives" special license plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 330 (HA 1 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 330 (HA 3 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 330 (*HA 1 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 43 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 330 (HA 3, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 330 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 330 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseS Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 330-Brown, with HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended & HA 4
2019-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended
2019-05-15HouseHA 5 H offered & defeated (McCreery)--(1740S03.16H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 4 H adopted
2019-05-15HouseHA 1 to H 4 H offered & withdrawn (Miller)--(1740S03.25H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 4 H offered (Black-137)--(1740S03.07H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 3, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-15HouseHA 3 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Kidd)--(1740S03.23H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 2 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Roden)--(1740S03.22H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 1 to HA 3 H offered & defeated (Ingle)--(1740S03.20H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 3 H offered (Knight)--(1740S03.17H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (Hansen)--(1740S03.11H)
2019-05-15HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (Sharpe)--(1740S03.12H)
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-01HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-01HouseReported Do Pass H Utilities
2019-04-30HouseVoted Do Pass H Utilities
2019-04-23HouseHearing Conducted H Utilities
2019-04-17HouseReferred H Utilities
2019-04-15HouseH Second Read
2019-04-11HouseH First Read
2019-04-11SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-08SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-08SenatePerfected
2019-04-08SenateSCS S adopted
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-07SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2019-02-28SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1740S.03C)
2019-02-21SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-04SenateS First Read--SB 330-Brown

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2885769
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB330.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/comm/SB330.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB330.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay500411698-716.pdf#706
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.018.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.016.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.015.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.013.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback