MO SB328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 328-Burlison, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 328-Burlison, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the administrative rulemaking process by state agencies
Title
Modifies the administrative rulemaking process by state agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 328-Burlison, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1757S.02C) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SB 328-Burlison |