MO SB323 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to offer elective social studies courses on the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament
Title
Allows school districts to offer elective social studies courses on the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (HA 9) (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (HA 9) (Y: 95 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 General (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 General (Y: 127 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 General (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 323 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 323 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 323 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 26 NV: 12 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (HA 9) (Y: 95 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 General (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 General (Y: 127 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 General (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: SB 323 (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 323 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 323 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 323 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 26 NV: 12 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & defeated (Merideth)--(1585H02.16H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burnett)--(1585H02.24H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(1585H02.17H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lewis-6)--(1585H02.38H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollitt-52)--(1585H02.36H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-70)--(1585H02.35H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Shields)--(1585H02.17H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Buchheit-Courtway)--(1585H02.02H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(1585H02.30H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bayse)--(1585H02.33H) |
2021-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(1585H02.32H) |
2021-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider HA 2 to HCS H adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider HCS, as amended, H Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider H Third Reading Vote Adopted |
2021-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(1585H02.09H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Patterson)--(1585H02.28H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hicks)--(1585H02.29H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Richey)--(1585H02.30H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(1585H02.19H) |
2021-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-10 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2021-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2021-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2021-05-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2021-04-29 | House | H Second Read |
2021-04-28 | House | H First Read |
2021-04-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & defeated (Razer)--(1585S01.02S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Razer)--(1585S01.01S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled |