MO SB321 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies restrictions on the political activity of certain state employees
Title
Modifies restrictions on the political activity of certain state employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S First Read--SB 321-Hegeman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2393786 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB321.pdf |