MO SB321 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows victims of sexual assault to receive protective orders and modifies the definitions of sexual assault and stalking as they relate to orders of protection
Title
Allows victims of sexual assault to receive protective orders and modifies the definitions of sexual assault and stalking as they relate to orders of protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(1290S03.02S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (1290S.03C) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 321-Hegeman |