MO SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 318-Burlison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 318-Burlison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Expanded Workforce Access Act of 2019
Title
Establishes the Expanded Workforce Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 318-Burlison |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 318-Burlison |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2339902 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB318.pdf |