MO SB317 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the suspension of licenses for failure to comply with a child support order

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the suspension of licenses for failure to comply with a child support order

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
2021-04-01SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-03-30SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-03-09SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-02-04SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-22SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback