MO SB315 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2015-05-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued - Action Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1, HCA 2, HCA 3, HCA 4 & HCA 5 |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2015-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-30 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-30 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-03-30 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted (1687S.02C) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (1687S.02C) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 315-Dixon |