MO SB314 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 314 & 340-Schatz, et al, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Narcotics Control Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Narcotics Control Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 314 & 340-Schatz, et al, with SCS
2017-03-07SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2017-02-09SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 314 & 340 attached) Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1440S.02C )
2017-02-09SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-19SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-18SenateS First Read--SB 314-Schatz

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback