MO SB307 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to spousal maintenance orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to spousal maintenance orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-03-04SenateHearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-28SenateS First Read--SB 307-Cierpiot

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback