MO SB30 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - In Conference--SB 30-Sater, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - In Conference--SB 30-Sater, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions to political subdivisions
Title
Enacts provisions to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 30 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 30 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 30 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 30 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 30 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | In Conference--SB 30-Sater, with HCS, as amended |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (0478S03.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | H conferees appointed: Fitzpatrick, Fraker, Ruth, Stevens-46, Morgan |
2017-05-11 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Hegeman, Cunningham, Walsh, Schupp |
2017-05-11 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (May)--(0478H02.25H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roeber)--(0478H02.34H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0478H02.66H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(0478H02.33H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(0478H02.36H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(0478H02.61H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(0478H02.57H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Houghton)--(0478H02.43H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(0478H02.28H) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-12 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2017-03-28 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 30-Sater |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |