MO SB299 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the remittance of certain tax liabilities
Title
Extends the deadline for the remittance of certain tax liabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 299-Rizzo, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2044464 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB299.pdf |