MO SB299 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows certain people to enter abandoned property to secure it, remove trash and graffiti, and maintain the grounds, and provides immunity from civil and criminal liability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows certain people to enter abandoned property to secure it, remove trash and graffiti, and maintain the grounds, and provides immunity from civil and criminal liability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
2017-05-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2017-05-02HouseExecutive postponed H General Laws
2017-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2017-04-19HouseReferred H General Laws
2017-03-06HouseH Second Read
2017-03-02HouseH First Read
2017-03-01SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent
2017-02-16SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted
2017-02-16SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-19SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-17SenateS First Read--SB 299-Curls

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback