MO SB298 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 298-White, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts provisions relating to payments for health care services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions relating to payments for health care services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 298-White, with SCS
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS
2019-03-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (1410S.04C)
2019-02-20SenateHearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-02-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-01-24SenateS First Read--SB 298-White

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback