MO SB297 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows individuals 75 years of age or older to be excused from petit and grand jury service

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows individuals 75 years of age or older to be excused from petit and grand jury service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 297 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseHCS H defeated
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Formal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-06HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-01HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-04-18HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-04-10HouseReferred H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-04-08HouseH Second Read
2019-04-04HouseH First Read
2019-04-04SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-03SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-03SenatePerfected
2019-02-28SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-25SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-18SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-02-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2019-01-24SenateS First Read--SB 297-White

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback