MO SB297 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Defeated on S Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - Defeated on S Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to water utilities
Title
Modifies provisions related to water utilities
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Defeated on S Third Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SA 5 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(8069S13.01S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SA 4 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(8057S13.02S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offeredn & adopted (Rupp)--(8038S13.02S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(1352S05.07S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(1352S05.03S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Parson)--(1352S05.02S) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (1352S.05C) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 297-Lager |