MO SB294 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts insurers from the requirement to send an explanation of refusal to write automobile insurance if the applicant is written on a policy by an affiliate or subsidiary insurer within the same holding company
Title
Exempts insurers from the requirement to send an explanation of refusal to write automobile insurance if the applicant is written on a policy by an affiliate or subsidiary insurer within the same holding company
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled |