MO SB294 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to workers' compensation for firefighters
Title
Creates new provisions relating to workers' compensation for firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 294-Hough |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2044459 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB294.pdf |