MO SB293 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 293-Hough, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 293-Hough, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new criminal offenses involving critical infrastructure facilities
Title
Creates new criminal offenses involving critical infrastructure facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 293-Hough, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (1657S.04C) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 293-Hough |