MO SB287 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows enrollment in a health benefit plan by a pregnant person under certain circumstances
Title
Allows enrollment in a health benefit plan by a pregnant person under certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (1469S.02C) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 287-Wieland |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1977943 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB287.pdf |