MO SB285 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 285-Romine
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows certain law enforcement agencies access to electronic monitoring information regarding sexually violent predators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows certain law enforcement agencies access to electronic monitoring information regarding sexually violent predators

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateS Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 285-Romine
2013-04-23SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2013-04-04SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor
2013-04-02SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2013-03-04SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2013-02-20SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2013-02-07SenateS First Read--SB 285-Romine

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback