MO SB283 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to liquor sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to liquor sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2021-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2021-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2021-05-13HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-05-12HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2021-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2021-05-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2021-05-04HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2021-05-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
2021-05-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2021-04-26HouseExecutive Session continued - Action Postponed
2021-04-19HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2021-04-14HouseReferred H General Laws
2021-03-26HouseH Second Read
2021-03-25HouseH First Read
2021-03-25SenateS Third Read and Passed
2021-03-23SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-03-22SenatePerfected
2021-03-22SenateSS, as amended, S adopted
2021-03-22SenateSA 4 to SS S offered & defeated (Schatz)--(1140S03.10S)
2021-03-22SenateSA 3 to SS, as amended, S adopted
2021-03-22SenateSA 2 to SA 3 to SS S offered & defeated (May)--(1140S03.09S)
2021-03-22SenateSA 1 to SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Burlison)--(1140S03.08S)
2021-03-22SenateSA 3 to SS S offered (Hoskins)--(1140S03.06S)
2021-03-22SenateSA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Bernskoetter)--(1140S03.05S)
2021-03-22SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(1140S03.01S)
2021-03-22SenateSS S offered (Hoskins)--(1140S.03F)
2021-02-25SenateReported from S General Laws Committee
2021-02-23SenateVoted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
2021-02-09SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2021-02-04SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-08SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54394311
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB283.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/perf/SB283.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0283.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3391
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3395
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3397
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3398
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3400
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3401
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3403
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134230312&BillID=54394311
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1140S.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=140528322&BillID=54394311
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1140S.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1140H.06C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=144932456&BillID=54394311
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/Journals/RDay390325553-568.pdf#562

Bill Comments 750

feedback