MO SB282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the disposition of human remains

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the disposition of human remains

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 282 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 282 (*HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 282 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateVetoed by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-17SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-17HouseS Third Read and Passed
2019-05-17HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2019-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-16HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-16HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burnett)--(1541H03.04H)
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-09HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Special Committee on Aging
2019-05-08HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Aging
2019-05-01HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Aging
2019-04-24HouseReferred H Special Committee on Aging
2019-04-24HouseH Second Read
2019-04-23HouseH First Read
2019-04-18SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-18SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-17SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-11SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2019-04-11SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-10SenatePerfected, as amended
2019-04-10SenateSA 2 S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(1541S01.02S)
2019-04-10SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(1541S01.01S)
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-07SenateReported from S General Laws Committee
2019-03-05SenateVoted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
2019-02-19SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2019-02-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2019-01-22SenateS First Read--SB 282-Brown

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1926667
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB282.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB282.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0282.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/tat/SB282.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay540418762-783.pdf#766
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/071.029.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/071.028.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/071.027.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1677
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1677

Bill Comments

feedback